Financial history LAMBETH ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1037989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £24.96k £36.11k £33.66k £24.23k £19.55k
Total expenditure £28.57k £29.41k £29.27k £27.53k £19.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A