LAMBETH ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
Governance
- 25 May 1994: Standard registration
- BRIXTON MOSQUE (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imran Khan | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Khalid Khan | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SAEED SIDDIQUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMAD AJMAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.96k | £36.11k | £33.66k | £24.23k | £19.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.57k | £29.41k | £29.27k | £27.53k | £19.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 09 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 28 JANUARY 1994
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE LAMBETH
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Bellefields Road
LONDON
SW9 9UQ
- Phone:
- 07956591807
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window