NEW LIFE COMMUNITY CHURCH NORTH WALSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a church operating in and serving North Walsham and the surrounding areas. We carry out regular church activities - church services and so on - as well as running an assortment of social activities, children's and youth groups. We are also involved in other various activities such as counselling, particularly pregnancy crisis and bereavement counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 25 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN DALLAIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Neil Lawrence | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lysa Owen | Trustee | 25 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barnabas Lee | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tim Greene | Trustee | 01 February 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.92k | £41.44k | £66.57k | £59.24k | £123.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.20k | £30.97k | £34.98k | £40.48k | £199.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2) RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED,HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK 3) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
New Life Building
Laundry Loke
NORTH WALSHAM
Norfolk
NR28 0BD
- Phone:
- 07413 257721
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window