Financial history EMPLOYERS NETWORK ON DISABILITY FOR MILTON KEYNES

Charity number: 1038025
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £131.35k £7.19k £29.93k £0 £0
Total expenditure £128.18k £16.78k £32.05k £3.53k £474
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A