PRINCEFIELD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for additional facilities and activities within school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 26 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Barron | Chair | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Birch | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lance Green | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Turnbull | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
LISA MCVEIGH | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARA HASSALL | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louise Foreman | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Kinns | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emma Weaver | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01k | £101 | £327 | £12.58k | £15.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.33k | £887 | £1.26k | £4.95k | £19.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED 4 OCTOBER 1993 AND 1 MARCH 1994 as amended on 19 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Willow Close
Penkridge
STAFFORD
ST19 5UB
- Phone:
- 07967650593
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window