THE VIRGINIA KEILEY BENEFACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Benefaction promotes or assists in the promotion of research into the causes, prevention, alleviation and treatment of neurological movement disorders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL ELIZABETH OCKELFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ANDREW JOHN LEES MD FRCP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £746 | £170 | £6.01k | £2.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.95k | £43.78k | £21.04k | £23.27k | £20.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH MAY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ASSIST IN THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION,ALLEVIATION AND TREATMENTS OF NEUROLOGICAL MOVEMENT DISORDERS PARTICULARLY BY THE DEPARTMENT OF NEUROLOGY UNIVERSITY COLLEGE AND MIDDLESEX HOSPITALS GOWER STREET, LONDON WC1 AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Spinney Lane
Welwyn
AL6 9TF
- Phone:
- 01438 816256
- Email:
- neurol@hertsadmin.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window