Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF MAR DYKE VALLEY CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1038108
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.15k £140 £12.75k £17.21k £32.58k
Total expenditure £16.50k £3.56k £6.99k £18.31k £23.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A