North Norfolk Festival of Performing Arts

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise and run an annual festival for music dance and speech, to give amateurs the opportunity to perform in public and have the opportunity to be invigilated by professionals to increase their confidence and have the chance to see and hear other performers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 June 1994: Standard registration
- CROMER & N NORFOLK FESTIVAL & MUSIC SPEECH & DANCE (Working name)
- THE CROMER FESTIVAL (Working name)
- CROMER AND NORTH NORFOLK FESTIVAL OF MUSIC, DANCE AND SPEECH (Previous name)
- CROMER AND NORTH NORFOLK FESTIVAL OF MUSIC,DRAMA AND DANCE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH HOBDAY | Chair | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Lucy Murphy | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thomson | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA GWENDOLINE DURRANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £620 | £47 | £7.61k | £12.88k | £555 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.93k | £157 | £5.37k | £7.86k | £14.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 24TH JUNE 2002. as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS,AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC,SPEECH AND DRAMA AND DANCE,IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CROMER AND NORTH NORFOLK,CENTRAL NOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 LYNEWOOD ROAD
CROMER
NR27 0EE
- Phone:
- 01263515247
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window