Financial history FRIENDS OF DOWNSVIEW SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.30k £2.75k £3.68k £1.03k £2.60k
Total expenditure £13.26k £3.19k £1.65k £3.52k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A