COPDOCK WITH WASHBROOK CHURCH HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1038132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raising funds for the repair and upkeep of St Peters Church Copdock

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £7,814
Total expenditure: £1,760

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Louise Amphlett-Lewis Chair 21 March 2016
None on record
Allison Maria Sarah Warr Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Semra Hicks Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
William Alan Amphlett-Lewis Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record
Adriam Basham Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record
MICHAEL ERIC WATLING Trustee
None on record
MAUREEN ANN SOUTHGATE Trustee
None on record
RUTH KATHLEEN LINCOLN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.10k £853 £2.64k £5.33k £7.81k
Total expenditure £13.81k £207 £450 £459 £1.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 03 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 June 2024 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Huntley House
The Street
Copdock
IPSWICH
IP8 3HT
Phone:
01473730776
Website:

No information available