HIGHWAY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the christian religion by proclamation and example.This is achieved through regular services in worship and other events, the release of workers for action in the local community, involvement with other churches and pursuing other charitable purposes as the trustees shall from time to time think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 31 May 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harvey Crook | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Darren Stevens | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN FRANCIS NORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.04k | £91.41k | £86.01k | £92.98k | £118.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.49k | £72.63k | £71.78k | £78.03k | £139.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £250 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 December 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 December 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2024 | 308 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 597 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2024 | 597 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 February 2024 | 842 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 February 2024 | 842 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2022 | 722 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2022 | 722 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 15 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highway Church
Church Road
PENRYN
TR10 8DA
- Phone:
- 01326378433
- Email:
- admin@highwaychurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window