Financial history WORTHING MUSIC AND ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1038211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £41.00k £6.50k £23.55k £34.92k £39.68k
Total expenditure £26.00k £9.50k £18.73k £34.09k £22.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A