THE HEADLEY SPORTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for recreation for the benefit of the Parish of Headley and, in particular, to look after the management and upkeep of the Margery Wheatley Pavilion sited on the Headley Playing Fields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- HEADLEY SPORTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLIE KEMP | Chair |
|
||||||
Darren Foulds | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ellis | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Milton | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Measures | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alec Brodrick | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE GROVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Derek Hubbard | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE HARROD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.02k | £10.47k | £7.23k | £14.92k | £8.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.14k | £5.83k | £9.24k | £9.96k | £13.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/04/1994 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION (OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HEADLEY AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS OF WHOM ITS FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF HEADLEY, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCK COTTAGE
BEECH HILL ROAD
HEADLEY
BORDON
GU35 8DN
- Phone:
- 01428713922
- Email:
- derek324@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window