Accounts and annual returns DUNDRY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1038240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 May 2023 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 May 2023 335 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 May 2022 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 03 May 2022 307 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 March 2022 627 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 March 2022 627 days late Download Open in new window