THE ST ALBANS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to advance the education of the public in the appreciation of orchestral music by the provision of public performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 June 1994: Standard registration
- SASO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Austin Allen | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hartgroves | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Lunt | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Mary MacKenzie | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Wallace | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JANE CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Stott | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISON BELLERBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE ANNE DRURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.99k | £6.49k | £24.99k | £20.52k | £24.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.65k | £4.16k | £18.54k | £18.27k | £20.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED 11 MAY 1994 as amended on 06 Jun 2018 as amended on 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF ORCHESTRAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC ORCHESTRAL MUSIC AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 4
Gilliflower House
Yewlands
Hoddesdon
EN11 8DT
- Phone:
- 02077654523
- Email:
- secretary@saso.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window