Financial history THE ROGER DE CLARE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1038291
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015
Total gross income £11.00k £11.28k £11.10k £8.39k £5.91k
Total expenditure £10.90k £9.37k £12.59k £8.85k £5.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A