THE ROGER DE CLARE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 June 1994: Standard registration
- 09 January 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £11.28k | £11.10k | £8.39k | £5.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.90k | £9.37k | £12.59k | £8.85k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 06 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 31 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FOR BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY). 2) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN LAW AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window