THE ROTARY CLUB OF TAUNTON CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to raise and distribute money for the poor and needy or for any other charitable purpose, institution, object or society as club members shall direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Jane Khodabandehloo | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Anthony William Murray | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Peter Dowsett | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian John Prior-Sankey MBE | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.63k | £24.51k | £29.48k | £18.37k | £11.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.75k | £15.57k | £33.18k | £19.01k | £13.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WYNDHAM ROAD
TAUNTON
TA2 6DX
- Phone:
- 07741200120
- Email:
- nott4u@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window