Financial history MICHAEL WATSON TRUST FOR PSYCHODRAMA

Charity number: 1038304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £237 £356 £0 £568 £1.41k
Total expenditure £142 £69 £246 £2.17k £60
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A