GRESHAM VILLAGE HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gresham Village Hall has been at the heart of our community for 30 years. Its a place where generations have come together for celebrations, companionship, and support. Our village is made up of people from all walks of life, and the hall remains a warm, welcoming space where everyone is valued and included.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nishaa Tweed | Chair | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janet Bolderston | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Goodrum | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Russell | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hannam | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Arnold | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOY ANN COOPER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.75k | £19.31k | £6.78k | £6.15k | £6.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.80k | £4.32k | £15.19k | £5.26k | £7.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
THE BUILDING AND MAINTAINING OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GRESHAM,NORFOLK AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
GRESHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gresham Village Hall
Church Lane
Gresham
NORWICH
NR11 8RT
- Phone:
- 01263673093
- Email:
- greshamvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window