THE WILKINS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working in Nepal to advance education, relieve poverty, preserve and protect the health of poor communities, conserve, protect and restore the natural resources, beauty, plant and animal life through rural community development and conservation projects, work with local organisations to promote disability rights issues and to enable disabled children to achieve their potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nepal
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- W M T (Working name)
- WMT (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH ANNE WILKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BENJAMIN TIMOTHY COX | Trustee | 12 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM LUND | Trustee | 11 November 2011 |
|
|||||
SALLY ELIZABETH LUND | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN THOMAS BATE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MELANIE DAWN HICKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JOHN COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLYNIS ANN BATE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/04/2020 | 10/04/2021 | 10/04/2022 | 10/04/2023 | 10/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.20k | £16.78k | £20.12k | £19.87k | £10.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.72k | £16.13k | £17.76k | £21.79k | £20.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BUT IN PARTICULAR TO THE INHABITANTS OF NEPAL TO 1. ADVANCE EDUCATION 2. RELIEVE POVERTY 3.PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH 4. CONSERVE PROTECT AND RESTORE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE NATURAL RESOURCES NATURAL BEAUTY AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE OF ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE BUT PARTICULARLY NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 CORNMOOR ROAD
WHICKHAM
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE16 4PU
- Phone:
- 01914889158
- Email:
- info@wmt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window