Financial history THE CITY OF LONDON POLICE FEDERATION RUPERT FUND

Charity number: 1038350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.80k £14.95k £13.49k £8.11k £21.25k
Total expenditure £31.87k £2.33k £23.36k £37.15k £24.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A