GUNNESS AND BURRINGHAM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre School Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 September 2023
Total income includes £70,736 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 03 June 1994: Standard registration
- GUNNESS AND BURRINGHAM PLAYSCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Andrews-Longbone | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Gray | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adele Louise Asher | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Jones | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Laura Chantel Barbato | Trustee | 06 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peck | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/09/2019 | 05/09/2020 | 05/09/2021 | 05/09/2022 | 05/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.93k | £50.12k | £63.86k | £58.85k | £89.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.15k | £54.65k | £61.62k | £69.57k | £69.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £70.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Church View
160 High Street
Burringham
SCUNTHORPE
DN17 3LY
- Phone:
- 01724784622
- Email:
- CPeck21@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window