Trustees STEPPING STONES PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1038393

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Catherine Grace Fletcher | Chair | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Robert Heward | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hendy Bep Cockbain | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amyleigh Hilden | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Eastwood | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Lesley Burwood-Wilson | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Senka Cicvara | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bailey | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Clare Simester | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fletcher-Hillis | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.