Accounts and annual returns WAYUP TRUST

Charity Number: 1038401
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 10 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 03 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 22 June 2009 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 29 November 2007 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required