LLANGURIG INDEPENDENT CEMETERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Burial ground in the village of Llangurig.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MILLS BOUND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ewan Aled Rees | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shane Pugh | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Bound | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN SHORT | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Carwyn REES | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Elizabeth HOWELLS | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GERALD LLOYD DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR HEFIN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STANLEY JOHN ABEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £336 | £848 | £331 | £820 | £767 | |
|
Total expenditure | £339 | £364 | £464 | £364 | £364 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 28 DECEMBER 1885
Charitable objects
NON-CONFORMIST BURYING GROUND FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LLANGURIG.
Area of benefit
LLANGURIG
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penhyle
Llangurig
LLANIDLOES
Powys
SY18 6SJ
- Phone:
- 01686440390
- Email:
- hazel-howells@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window