THE AUDREY PIPE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards to aspiring novelists, to encourage people of all ages to read and/or write fiction. Small grants to assist community integration for people with a disability or to facilitate a minimum quality of life for people with a disability. Grants to any individual or group to support a provision in isolated communities. Awards to individual or group who have suffered hardship through injustice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID PIPE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LYNN CHRISTINE FANCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE PIPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £909 | £267 | £1.01k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.06k | £6.07k | £6.10k | £72 | £9.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS EXHIBITIONS AND BURSARIES FOR YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE IN A CONDITION OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ARISING THEREFROM AND WHO WISH TO PURSUE A CAREER AS AN AUTHOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWEET BRIAR
LANREATH
LOOE
PL13 2NX
- Phone:
- 01503220860
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window