Financial history 23RD BRIGHTON (ST MARGARETS, ROTTINGDEAN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1038412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £22.98k £14.39k £21.61k £10.48k £8.20k
Total expenditure £16.72k £8.84k £6.10k £25.38k £11.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £20.71k £2.67k N/A