Financial history SANDFORD COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT AND STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £8.41k £3.33k £612 £6.89k £556
Total expenditure £7.30k £15.57k £658 £6.71k £89
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A