THE ORPINGTON FESTIVAL OF DANCE

Charity number: 1038420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity runs a childrens dance festival and is affiliated to the British and International federation of festivals for music dance and speech.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £14,740
Total expenditure: £12,861

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
India Osbourne Chair 20 May 2019
None on record
Lucy-Anna Littlefield Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Virginia Litlefield Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Kathleen Patricia Filer Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £13.81k £2.27k £13.78k £16.48k £14.74k
Total expenditure £15.50k £2.55k £15.35k £17.77k £12.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 27 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 06 October 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 Braeburn Heights
Barley Close
GREENHITHE
Kent
DA9 9YP
Phone:
07715655580
Website:

orpingtonfestivalofdance.co.uk