ST PETER'S CHURCH PLAYGROUP (WEST BLATCHINGTON)
Charity Number: 1038423
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Total income: £50,138
Total expenditure: £85,267
Fundraising
This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 April 2011: Re-registered
- 19 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.98k | £46.26k | £50.92k | £50.56k | £50.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.70k | £50.57k | £47.39k | £43.36k | £85.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 10 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 10 February 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 23 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 23 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 07 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 07 June 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 31 October 2012 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 31 October 2012 | 123 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 5 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window