Financial history ALL SAINTS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £12.58k £11.45k £4.30k £14.77k £25.24k
Total expenditure £20.41k £21.41k £3.16k £6.82k £13.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A