ALL SAINTS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSA is a parent /teacher association which raises money in order to enhance and enrich the children's experiences whilst at school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- ALL SAINTS P T A (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah M Innes | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Fonseca | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Leigh Vernon | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Kirk Pettifor | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jonathan Lewis | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £4.30k | £14.77k | £25.24k | £31.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.41k | £3.16k | £6.82k | £13.57k | £38.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE- THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints C of E Junior School
Leawood Road
Fleet
GU51 5AJ
- Phone:
- 01252614776
- Email:
- assatreasurers@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window