HANSLOPE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through a community group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £155,523 from 155523 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- HANSLOPE TODDLER AND PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Courtney | Chair | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Marie Elia | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paige Winkworth | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grace Catherine Maxey | Trustee | 11 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Claire Barnett | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.70k | £87.25k | £119.16k | £149.04k | £192.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.05k | £81.46k | £101.27k | £124.95k | £153.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £41.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £155.52k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/06/1992 AS AMENDED ON 26/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hanslope Preschool
Hanslope Primary School
Long Street Road, Hanslope
MILTON KEYNES
MK19 7BL
- Phone:
- 07977721755
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window