Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE CITY VARIETIES

Charity number: 1038435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.24k £2.05k £2.57k £659 £3.32k
Total expenditure £5.93k £955 £945 £2.08k £3.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A