THE MONSOON ACCESSORIZE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 1994, the Monsoon Accessorize Trust helps women and children in Asia through education, healthcare and income generation projects. www.monsoontrust.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- India
- Nepal
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- THE MONSOON TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Holloway | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Pine | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £242.07k | £94.78k | £43.81k | £196.62k | £351.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.38k | £84.08k | £124.79k | £314.65k | £173.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 December 2022 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 1994, AS AMENDED BY AMENDING DEED OF 6 JUNE 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF IN CASES OF POVERTY NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS RESIDENT IN INDIA WHO ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF ILL HEALTH DISEASE EPIDEMIC DROUGHT EARTHQUAKE FLOOD OR OTHER NATURAL DISASTER (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS RESIDENT IN INDIA
Area of benefit
ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AND INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
MONSOON ACCESSORIZE TRUST
MONSOON BUILDING
1 NICHOLAS ROAD
LONDON
W11 4AN
- Phone:
- 07801766921
- Email:
- monsoontrust@monsoon.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window