Lympstone Preschool

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A committee run pre-school setting offering education for children aged 2 to 4 years in the Parish of Lympstone and its immediate vicinity. We are registered and regulated by Ofsted (good grading) and are affiliated with the PreSchool Learning Alliance and abide by their constitution. We also offer and run a Breakfast, After School and holiday club for primary aged children to the age of 11.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 07 June 1994: Standard registration
- LYMPSTONE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Lyon | Chair | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alice Hobbs | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Takacs | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Bacon | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Garrod | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.99k | £163.08k | £226.04k | £216.84k | £262.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.79k | £185.45k | £215.04k | £206.69k | £223.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015 as amended on 20 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lympstone Preschool
School Hill
Lympstone
EXMOUTH
EX8 5JY
- Phone:
- 07395391052
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window