THE JOHN TURLEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide supported housing accommodation in the community with associated amenities for the mentally ill or disabled.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patricia Mary Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR C WHITMARSH-EVERISS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
B N SIMMONDS ESQ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129 | £26.03k | £33.91k | £50.54k | £51.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.08k | £6.22k | £7.02k | £4.52k | £20.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 108 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE HOUSING AND HOSTEL ACCOMODATION IN THE COMMUNITY AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR EX-PSYCHIATRIC PATIENTS AND OTHER PERSONS SUFFERING OR RECOVERING FROM MENTAL HANDICAP OR DISABILITY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "PATIENTS") AND FOR OTHER PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS. 2) TO SUPPORT BY WAY OF GRANTS, LOANS OF MONEY OR OF PROVISION OF THE USE OF THE CHARITY'S FACILITIES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION OR OTHERWISE HOWSOEVER ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS, ASSOCIATIONS OR INSTITUTIONS FORMED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PARK CRESCENT
FRENCHAY
BRISTOL
BS16 1PD
- Phone:
- 07768077864
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window