FRIENDS OF SMITHILLS HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Smithills Hall, working in partnership with Bolton council, seek to enhance and preserve the attractions of Smithills Hall, a building of architectural and historic interest open to the public. The Friends undertake fundraising activities and provide volunteers to work at the Hall as guides and in other capacities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bolton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 June 1994: Standard registration
- 19 November 2018: Funds received from 251385 FRIENDS OF BOLTON MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norma Boothman | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Brown | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Anne Warburton | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Lomas | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ELLISON | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY JOAN EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.06k | £595 | £1.56k | £2.71k | £3.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £385 | £1.55k | £1.75k | £4.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 March 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 31 MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SMITHILLS HALL BEING A BUILDING OF HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BOLTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BOLTON AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SMITHILLS HALL
SMITHILLS DEAN ROAD
BOLTON
BL1 7NP
- Phone:
- 01204338722
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window