Financial history THRIFTWOOD SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1038508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £4.17k £687 £707 £1.94k £8.01k
Total expenditure £5.36k £1.31k £226 £8.90k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A