Financial history FRIENDS OF NORTHYCOTE FARM COUNTRY PARK

Charity number: 1038511
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.60k £4.42k £20.50k £17.44k £10.15k
Total expenditure £7.46k £3.72k £14.76k £11.69k £24.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.00k £5.55k N/A