Trustees FRIENDS OF NORTHYCOTE FARM COUNTRY PARK

Charity number: 1038511
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philippa Penny Trustee 14 September 2024
None on record
Angela Louden Trustee 17 September 2022
None on record
Kevin Higgins Trustee 24 July 2021
None on record
Robert Louden Trustee 15 May 2013
None on record
ANNE HAYES Trustee 01 September 1994
None on record
JANE ELIZABETH ANNE TYLER Trustee
None on record