Financial history MILTON ROAD PRIMARY SCHOOL'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038520
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £43.66k £22.44k £16.01k £24.36k £38.70k
Total expenditure £25.59k £35.66k £16.38k £18.06k £32.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A