THE CHARITY EQUITY FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHARITY COMMON INVESTMENT FUND. AIMS TO PROVIDE PARTICIPATING CHARITIES WITH A TOTAL RETURN (INCOME AND CAPITAL GROWTH) IN EXCESS OF THE FTSE ALL SHARE INDEX OVER FIVE YEAR ROLLING PERIODS.
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 1994: Standard registration
- 31 July 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 31 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1178343 SUTL CAZENOVE CHARITY UCITS FUND
- CHARITY EQUITY FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16m | £5.30m | £5.16m | £5.40m | £5.89m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.00m | £5.94m | £5.91m | £6.29m | £6.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION OF 11TH JUNE 2007 AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME DATED 16 OCTOBER 2009 SCHEME AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/07/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITIES PARTICIPATING IN THE SCHEME, OF A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND FOR INVESTMENT OF CASH AND OTHER PROPERTY TRANSFERRED TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE FUND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window