HUGHES TRAVEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust mainly fulfils its charitable objectives amongst the international group of Christian believers known as the Brethren by providing subsidised travel for those in necessitous circumstances and making travel arrangements to enable members of the Brethren community to attend religious conferences and gospel preaching of the Word of God.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 June 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Diffey | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
CYRIL DAVID PARSONS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW TURNER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £913.64k | £1.77m | £13.52k | £13.52k | £2.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.78m | £1.96m | £107.10k | £107.10k | £313.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £103.34k | £320.90k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £20.16k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £787.07k | £1.44m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.06k | £3.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.72m | £1.95m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.05k | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £308.09k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £65.72k | £6.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 JUNE 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AMONGST THE BRETHREN. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE TRUST DEED)
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chancery House
30 St Johns Road
Woking
Woking
Surrey
GU21 7SA
- Phone:
- 07825064166
- Email:
- Andy.Turner@htt-uk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window