JELLY BABIES PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE AFFORDABLE QUALITY CHILDCARE FOR RESIDENTS I N THE FAILSWORTH AREA.WE ARE OFSTED INSPECTED AND DELIVER THE EYFS CIRRICULUM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 July 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oldham
Governance
- 29 June 1994: Standard registration
- 03 May 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JELLY BABIES PLAY GROUP (Working name)
- JELLY BABIES PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- JELLY BABIES PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/07/2006 | 21/07/2007 | 21/07/2008 | 21/07/2009 | 21/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £38.89k | £37.98k | £43.32k | £43.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.37k | £36.13k | £40.44k | £44.14k | £44.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 July 2010 | 03 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2010 | 02 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 21 July 2009 | 19 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2009 | 06 April 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 21 July 2008 | 11 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2008 | 28 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 21 July 2007 | 12 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 July 2007 | 21 April 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 26 JANUARY 1996 AND 16 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window