EASTON PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Easton Primary School Association is the parent teacher association of Easton Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 16 June 1994: Standard registration
- EASTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- EASTON PRIMARY SCHOOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sian Kingston | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Georgina Ann Annal | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL SINGLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.21k | £4.38k | £2.38k | £412 | £4.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £847 | £2.02k | £745 | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 282 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2022 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Easton Primary School
The Street
Easton
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 0ED
- Phone:
- 01728746387
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window