Accounts and annual returns THE DORKING CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1038608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 19 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 02 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 02 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window