Trustees THE CRAVEN U3A
Charity number: 1038617

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrienne Gilchrist | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Firm | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Perkins | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hoole | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Douglas Hirst | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Eames | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mick Richings | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne MacDonald | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.