Financial history NORTH NIBLEY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1038653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.01k £4.81k £9.71k £23.02k £25.11k
Total expenditure £12.91k £5.73k £16.41k £22.40k £22.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A